Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Pierre-Georges Dozolme

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Le Puy-en-Velay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1906BornCelles-sur-Durolle
31 Mar 193427.9Ordained PriestPriest
8 Feb 196053.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
8 Feb 196053.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Arcadia
11 May 196054.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arcadia
12 Oct 196054.4SucceededBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
2 Mar 197871.8ResignedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
4 Jan 199083.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Le Puy-en-Velay, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Pierre-Georges Dozolme:
Bishop Jean-Pierre-Georges Dozolme (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Le Puy-en-Velay

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 29.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015