Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean Cardinal Verdier, P.S.S. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Paris

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1864BornLacroix-Barrez
9 Apr 188723.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
18 Nov 192965.7AppointedArchbishop of Paris, France
16 Dec 192965.8Elevated to Cardinal
16 Dec 192965.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
29 Dec 192965.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Paris, France
9 Apr 194076.1DiedArchbishop of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Verdier:
Cardinal Jean Verdier P.S.S. (born , died ) Archbishop of Paris

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years
  • a cardinal for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 85

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013