Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop René Graffin, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Yaoundé, Cameroon

Titular Archbishop of Misthia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1899Born
28 Oct 192526.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
14 Dec 193132.6AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Yaoundé, Cameroon
14 Dec 193132.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Mosynopolis
19 Mar 193232.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mosynopolis
4 Mar 194343.8SucceededVicar Apostolic of Yaoundé, Cameroon
3 Mar 194949.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Doumé, Cameroon
15 Mar 195151.8ResignedVicar Apostolic of Doumé, Cameroon
14 Sep 195556.3AppointedArchbishop of Yaoundé, Cameroon
6 Sep 196162.3ResignedArchbishop of Yaoundé, Cameroon
6 Sep 196162.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Misthia
16 Apr 196767.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Yaoundé, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for René Graffin
Archbishop René Graffin C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Yaoundé

EventPlace
Birth PlacePontvallain, France

  • a priest for 41.4 years
  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018