Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Yaoundé

Archidioecesis Yaundensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Vacant
  • Jean Mbarga, Apostolic Administrator
  • Simon-Victor Tonyé Bakot, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 14 September 1955
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Cameroon
  • Square Kilometers: 4,964 (1,917 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Archeveche, B.P. 207, Yaounde, Cameroun
  • Telephone: 2201.1048/9
  • Fax: 2221.9735

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Cameroun
18 March 1890ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Two Guineas {Des Deux Guinées} Prefecture Apostolic of Cameroun (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Cameroun
2 January 1905ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Cameroun Vicariate Apostolic of Cameroun
12 June 1923Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Cameroun Prefecture Apostolic of Buéa (erected)
31 March 1931Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Cameroun Prefecture Apostolic of Douala (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Yaoundé
3 April 1931Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Cameroun Vicariate Apostolic of Yaoundé
3 March 1949Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Yaoundé Vicariate Apostolic of Doumé (erected)
Archdiocese of Yaoundé
14 September 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Yaoundé Archdiocese of Yaoundé
24 June 1961Territory LostArchdiocese of Yaoundé Diocese of Mbalmayo (erected)
6 July 1965Territory LostArchdiocese of Yaoundé Prefecture Apostolic of Bafia (erected)
3 July 1987Territory LostArchdiocese of Yaoundé Diocese of Obala (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Yaoundé
1950246,840501,00049.3%34761102,24411198ap1951
Archdiocese of Yaoundé
1970378,426511,60774.0%411121532,473180269ap1971
1980610,353780,00078.3%63921553,93717230170ap1981
1990506,5501,150,00044.0%66981643,08818926574ap1991
1999662,5001,513,50043.8%1281522802,366319380132ap2000
2000668,0001,515,00044.1%1341592932,279326380123ap2001
2001673,5001,530,00044.0%1241632872,346327389123ap2002
2002680,2351,545,30044.0%1391633022,252337404123ap2003
2003687,0001,560,60044.0%1111792902,368332414123ap2004
2004693,8001,576,20044.0%1101903002,312346443123ap2005
2010903,0001,881,00048.0%1712434142,181408623132ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 29 Jul 2013