Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Marie Benoît Balla

Deceased

Bishop of Bafia, Cameroon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1959Born
20 Jun 198728.1Ordained PriestPriest of Yaoundé, Cameroon
3 May 200343.9AppointedBishop of Bafia, Cameroon
12 Jul 200344.1Ordained BishopBishop of Bafia, Cameroon
31 May 2017³58.0DiedBishop of Bafia, Cameroon

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie Benoît Balla
Bishop Jean-Marie Benoît Balla (born , died ) Bishop of Bafia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOweng
Ordained BishopBafia, Diocese of Bafia

  • a priest for 29.9 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,422
  • d?: CB, 31 May 2017
  • d: CB, 2 Jun 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast