Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Athanase Bala, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bafia, Cameroon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1927Born
3 Jul 195528.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
31 May 197649.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Bafia, Cameroon
31 May 197649.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Gegi
26 Sep 197649.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gegi
21 Dec 197750.8SucceededBishop of Bafia, Cameroon
3 May 200376.1RetiredBishop of Bafia, Cameroon
3 Sep 201992.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Bafia, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Athanase Bala
Bishop Athanase Bala C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bafia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNlong
Death PlaceYaoundé, Archdiocese of Yaoundé

  • a priest for 64.1 years
  • a bishop for 42.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast