Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Atanga, S.J.

Archbishop of Bertoua, Cameroon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1952 Born
11 Jul 198734.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
22 Jun 199946.8AppointedBishop of Bafoussam, Cameroon
18 Sep 199947.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bafoussam, Cameroon
3 Dec 200957.3AppointedArchbishop of Bertoua, Cameroon
30 Jan 201057.4InstalledArchbishop of Bertoua, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Joseph Atanga
Archbishop Joseph Atanga S.J. (born ) Archbishop of Bertoua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAkok-Bekoe

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bertoua.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,614

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018