Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop André Wouking

Deceased

Archbishop of Yaoundé


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1930BornDschang
9 Apr 196130.8Ordained PriestPriest of Bafoussam, Cameroon
15 Mar 197948.8AppointedBishop of Bafoussam, Cameroon
9 Jun 197949.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bafoussam, Cameroon
27 Nov 199868.5AppointedArchbishop of Yaoundé, Cameroon
10 Nov 200272.4DiedArchbishop of Yaoundé, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for André Wouking:
Archbishop André Wouking (born , died ) Archbishop of Yaoundé

  • a priest for 41.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 5 Apr 2014