Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Buéa

Dioecesis Bueaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Emmanuel Bushu, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 18 April 1950
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Bamenda
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Cameroon
  • Square Kilometers: 13,410 (5,179 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://dioceseofbuea.org/
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, Soppo. P.O. Box 64, Buea, Fako Division, S.W. Region, Cameroon
  • Telephone: 3332.2241
  • Fax: 3332.2671

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Buéa
12 June 1923ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Cameroun Prefecture Apostolic of Buéa (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Buéa
15 March 1939ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Buéa Vicariate Apostolic of Buéa
Diocese of Buéa
18 April 1950ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Buéa Diocese of Buéa
14 July 1950Territory LostDiocese of Buéa
Prefecture Apostolic of Jos
Prefecture Apostolic of Oturkpo
Prefecture Apostolic of Yola (erected)
13 August 1970Territory LostDiocese of Buéa Diocese of Bamenda (erected)
9 February 1999Territory LostDiocese of Buéa Diocese of Mamfe (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Buéa
195052,240465,60011.2%153549671522ap1951
195673,219742,9599.9%159601,22022323ap1960
1970180,3561,200,00015.0%17861031,75111311242ap1971
1980128,000634,60020.2%1232442,909434919ap1981
1990177,700765,00023.2%3026563,173357721ap1991
1999187,000875,00021.4%2517424,452235216ap2000
2000176,709833,54521.2%2410345,1971717ap2001
2001176,709833,54521.2%307374,7751417ap2002
2002176,709833,54521.2%405453,9261117ap2003
2003274,024922,53629.7%455505,4801717ap2004
2004289,542950,00030.5%498575,079167019ap2005
2006302,223974,00031.0%5814724,197276522ap2007
2012400,3271,098,00036.5%6413775,1994310022ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 11 Feb 2014