Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Yola

Dioecesis Yolaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Stephen Dami Mamza, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 2 July 1962
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Jos
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Nigeria
  • Square Kilometers: 34,850 (13,460 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, P.O. Box 57, Jimeta, Yola, Adamawa State, Nigeria
  • Telephone: (075)62.46.00
  • Fax: 62.64.88

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Yola
14 July 1950ErectedDiocese of Buéa
Prefecture Apostolic of Jos
Prefecture Apostolic of Oturkpo
Prefecture Apostolic of Yola (erected)
Diocese of Yola
2 July 1962ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Yola Diocese of Yola
3 February 1995Territory LostDiocese of Yola Diocese of Jalingo (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Yola
19501,278903,784.1%720274737ap1951
Diocese of Yola
197013,8071,785,000.8%19197261910ap1971
1980116,0001,777,0006.5%715225,2721713ap1981
1990142,8664,398,0003.2%1723403,571302431ap1991
199996,0831,589,0006.0%225273,558112221ap2000
2000102,0891,770,5995.8%265313,293102221ap2001
2001106,3221,770,5996.0%245293,66691822ap2002
2002109,6672,124,0495.2%276333,323171823ap2003
2003114,6362,135,2405.4%286343,371161824ap2004
2004156,8902,135,2407.3%296354,482162224ap2005
2010182,7423,524,0005.2%346404,568182628ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 23 Jul 2013