Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Joseph Dalton, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Yola, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1909Born
14 Jul 193526.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
27 Oct 195041.5AppointedPrefect of Yola, Nigeria
2 Jul 196253.2AppointedBishop of Yola, Nigeria
29 Sep 196253.5Ordained BishopBishop of Yola, Nigeria
29 Nov 196960.6DiedBishop of Yola, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Patrick Joseph Dalton
Bishop Patrick Joseph Dalton O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Yola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAbbeyfeale, Ireland

  • a priest for 34.3 years
  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 163

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018