Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John MacCarthy, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Kaduna, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1902Born
9 Jun 192926.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
14 May 194340.8AppointedPrefect of Kaduna, Nigeria
10 Apr 195451.8AppointedBishop of Kaduna, Nigeria
15 Aug 195452.1Ordained BishopBishop of Kaduna, Nigeria
16 Jul 195957.0AppointedArchbishop of Kaduna, Nigeria
10 Apr 197572.8ResignedArchbishop of Kaduna, Nigeria
12 Jun 197572.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Kaduna, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for John MacCarthy
Archbishop John MacCarthy S.M.A. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Kaduna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastlehaven, Ireland

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018