Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Owerri

Archidioecesis Overriensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 26 March 1994
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Nigeria
  • Square Kilometers: 2,996 (1,157 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Villa Assumpta, P.O. Box 85, Owerri, Imo State, Nigeria
  • Telephone: (083)230.115

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Owerri
12 February 1948SplitVicariate Apostolic of Onitsha-Owerri Vicariate Apostolic of Onitsha
Vicariate Apostolic of Owerri
Diocese of Owerri
18 April 1950ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Owerri Diocese of Owerri
23 June 1958Territory LostDiocese of Owerri Diocese of Umuahia (erected)
16 May 1961Territory LostDiocese of Owerri Diocese of Port Harcourt (erected)
29 November 1980Territory LostDiocese of Owerri Diocese of Orlu (erected)
18 November 1987Territory LostDiocese of Owerri Diocese of Ahiara (erected)
Archdiocese of Owerri
26 March 1994ElevatedDiocese of Owerri Archdiocese of Owerri

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Owerri
1950249,6202,500,00010.0%749564,4572726ap1951
1970615,3192,000,00030.8%31751065,8041117850ap1971
19801,154,2352,188,00052.8%81109112,683267860ap1981
1990443,0271,198,14737.0%6015755,907818547ap1991
Archdiocese of Owerri
1999566,9651,561,15536.3%143271703,33510614067ap2000
2000580,3011,604,86736.2%141371783,26011415667ap2001
2001607,1031,654,07536.7%144381823,33511816371ap2002
2002633,2711,676,38637.8%165341993,18212016574ap2003
2003659,1141,692,41238.9%173422153,06513119184ap2004
2004670,9861,693,32939.6%189472362,84312714789ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.7.7, 29 Jan 2012; data: 15 Feb 2012