Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victor Adibe Chikwe

Deceased

Bishop of Ahiara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1938BornIhitte Ezinihitte
17 Apr 196627.8Ordained PriestPriest of Owerri, Nigeria
18 Nov 198749.4AppointedBishop of Ahiara, Nigeria
6 Jan 198849.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ahiara, Nigeria
16 Sep 201072.2DiedBishop of Ahiara, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Victor Adibe Chikwe:
Bishop Victor Adibe Chikwe (born , died ) Bishop of Ahiara

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,425
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013