Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mark Onwuha Unegbu

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Owerri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1917BornArondizuogu
30 Jun 194427.0Ordained PriestPriest of Onitsha-Owerri, Nigeria
12 Feb 194830.6IncardinatedPriest of Owerri, Nigeria
23 Jun 195841.0IncardinatedPriest of Umuahia, Nigeria
25 Jun 197053.0AppointedBishop of Owerri, Nigeria
20 Sep 197053.2Ordained BishopBishop of Owerri, Nigeria
1 Jul 199376.0RetiredBishop of Owerri, Nigeria
31 Oct 200285.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Owerri, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Mark Onwuha Unegbu:
Bishop Mark Onwuha Unegbu (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Owerri

  • a priest for 58.3 years
  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013