Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francis Cardinal Arinze

Prefect Emeritus of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments

Cardinal-Bishop of Velletri-Segni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1932 BornEziowelle
23 Nov 195826.1Ordained PriestPriest of Onitsha, Nigeria
6 Jul 196532.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Onitsha, Nigeria
6 Jul 196532.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Fissiana
29 Aug 196532.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fissiana
26 Jun 196734.7AppointedArchbishop of Onitsha, Nigeria
8 Apr 198451.4AppointedPro-Prefect of the Secretariat of Non-Christians
9 Mar 198552.4ResignedArchbishop of Onitsha, Nigeria
25 May 198552.6Elevated to Cardinal
25 May 198552.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Giovanni della Pigna
27 May 198552.6AppointedPresident of the Secretariat of Non-Christians
29 Jan 199663.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni della Pigna
1 Oct 200269.9AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments
2 Apr 200572.4CeasedPrefect of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments
21 Apr 200572.5ConfirmedPrefect of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments
25 Apr 200572.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Velletri-Segni
22 May 200572.6InstalledCardinal-Bishop of Velletri-Segni
9 Dec 200876.1RetiredPrefect of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments

MicroData Summary for Francis Arinze:
Francis Cardinal Arinze (born ) Prefect Emeritus of Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments

Please contact the Cardinal through the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 2 Sep 2014