Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ambroise Ouédraogo

Bishop of Maradi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1948 BornKossodo
29 Jun 197930.5Ordained PriestPriest of Ouagadougou, Burkina Faso
18 May 199950.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Niamey, Niger
18 May 199950.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Severiana
26 Sep 199950.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Severiana
13 Mar 200152.2AppointedBishop of Maradi, Niger

MicroData Summary for Ambroise Ouédraogo:
Bishop Ambroise Ouédraogo (born ) Bishop of Maradi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Maradi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,622

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 19 Feb 2014