Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Marie Untaani Compaoré

Archbishop Emeritus of Ouagadougou


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1933 BornSaganyônyôgo
8 Sep 196229.1Ordained PriestPriest of Ouagadougou, Burkina Faso
17 May 197339.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ouagadougou, Burkina Faso
17 May 197339.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamzella
28 Oct 197340.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamzella
15 Jun 197945.9AppointedBishop of Fada N’Gourma, Burkina Faso
10 Jun 199561.9AppointedArchbishop of Ouagadougou, Burkina Faso
13 May 200975.8RetiredArchbishop of Ouagadougou, Burkina Faso

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie Untaani Compaoré:
Archbishop Jean-Marie Untaani Compaoré (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Ouagadougou

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Ouagadougou.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 13 May 2009
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 11 Oct 2014