Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Kaboré

Bishop of Kaya, Burkina Faso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1943 Born
29 Jun 197026.7Ordained PriestPriest
19 Apr 199955.5AppointedBishop of Kaya, Burkina Faso
10 Jul 199955.7Ordained BishopBishop of Kaya, Burkina Faso

MicroData Summary for Thomas Kaboré
Bishop Thomas Kaboré (born ) Bishop of Kaya

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOuagadougou
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame de Kaya, Cathedral, Kaya, Diocese of Kaya

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kaya.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,583

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast