Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Théophile Nare

Bishop of Kaya, Burkina Faso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1966 Born
8 Jul 199529.0Ordained PriestPriest of Koupéla, Burkina Faso
7 Dec 201852.4AppointedBishop of Kaya, Burkina Faso
2 Mar 201952.6Ordained BishopBishop of Kaya, Burkina Faso

MicroData Summary for Théophile Nare
Bishop Théophile Nare (born ) Bishop of Kaya

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYargo, Archdiocese of Koupéla
Ordained BishopKaya, Diocese of Kaya

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kaya.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2018
  • ob: CB, 25 Jan 2019
  • c2+: CB, 2 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.3, 16 Feb 2019; Data: 3 Mar 2019

Quantcast