Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Koupéla

Archidioecesis Kupelaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 5 December 2000
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Burkina Faso
  • Square Kilometers: 7,470 (2,885 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: B.P. 51, Koupela, Burkina Faso
  • Telephone: 70.00.30
  • Fax: 70.02.65

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Koupéla
20 February 1956ErectedArchdiocese of Ouagadougou Diocese of Koupéla (erected)
26 June 1969Territory LostDiocese of Koupéla
Archdiocese of Ouagadougou
Diocese of Kaya (erected)
2 January 1997Territory LostDiocese of Koupéla
Archdiocese of Ouagadougou
Diocese of Manga (erected)
Archdiocese of Koupéla
5 December 2000ElevatedDiocese of Koupéla Archdiocese of Koupéla
11 February 2012Territory LostDiocese of Fada N’Gourma
Archdiocese of Koupéla
Diocese of Tenkodogo (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Koupéla
196929,495436,4146.8%192140737255111ap1971
198072,000600,00012.0%2617431,674235211ap1981
1990120,480699,00017.2%2914432,801165512ap1991
Archdiocese of Koupéla
1999182,8971,055,62817.3%497563,26675113ap2000
2000194,3441,085,85117.9%555603,23955114ap2001
2001200,6741,173,86917.1%684722,78745414ap2002
2002203,9971,169,61517.4%654692,95645214ap2003
2003213,0021,166,12518.3%654693,08645814ap2004
2004228,0371,248,12818.3%682703,25726215ap2005
2012116,082454,21225.6%51512,2763548bul:11Feb2012

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.7.8, 18 Feb 2012; data: 14 May 2012