Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gabriel Sayaogo

Archbishop of Koupéla, Burkina Faso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1962 Born
13 Jul 199129.5Ordained PriestPriest of Ouahigouya, Burkina Faso
28 Dec 201048.9AppointedBishop of Manga, Burkina Faso
30 Apr 201149.3Ordained BishopBishop of Manga, Burkina Faso
7 Dec 201957.9AppointedArchbishop of Koupéla, Burkina Faso

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Sayaogo
Archbishop Gabriel Sayaogo (born ) Archbishop of Koupéla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNiességa
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame de l`Assomption, Cathedral, Manga, Diocese of Manga

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Koupéla.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Dec 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,045
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 7 Dec 2019

Quantcast