Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wenceslas Compaoré

Bishop Emeritus of Manga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1934 BornKombissiri
8 Sep 196227.8Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jan 199762.2AppointedBishop of Manga, Burkina Faso
18 May 199762.5Ordained BishopBishop of Manga, Burkina Faso
28 Dec 201076.1RetiredBishop of Manga, Burkina Faso

MicroData Summary for Wenceslas Compaoré:
Bishop Wenceslas Compaoré (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Manga

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Manga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Dec 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,003

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013