Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Bobo-Dioulasso

Archidioecesis Bobodiulassensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 5 December 2000
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Burkina Faso
  • Square Kilometers: 24,415 (9,430 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Archeveche, Lafiaso, 01 B.P. 312, Bobo-Dioulasso, Burkina Faso
  • Telephone: 20.97.04.35

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Bobo-Dioulasso
15 December 1927ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Bamako
Vicariate Apostolic of Ouagadougou
Prefecture Apostolic of Bobo-Dioulasso (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Bobo-Dioulasso
9 March 1937ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Bobo-Dioulasso Vicariate Apostolic of Bobo-Dioulasso
9 June 1942Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Bamako
Vicariate Apostolic of Bobo-Dioulasso
Vicariate Apostolic of Ouagadougou
Prefecture Apostolic of Gao (erected)
12 June 1947Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Bobo-Dioulasso Prefecture Apostolic of Sikasoo (erected)
Diocese of Bobo-Dioulasso
14 September 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Bobo-Dioulasso Diocese of Bobo-Dioulasso
18 October 1968Territory LostDiocese of Bobo-Dioulasso Diocese of Diébougou (erected)
27 June 1998Territory LostDiocese of Bobo-Dioulasso Diocese of Banfora (erected)
Archdiocese of Bobo-Dioulasso
5 December 2000ElevatedDiocese of Bobo-Dioulasso Archdiocese of Bobo-Dioulasso

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Bobo-Dioulasso
195021,107662,7003.2%1414250213346ap1951
Diocese of Bobo-Dioulasso
195733,744590,4115.7%36366511296412ap1960
197023,380409,2625.7%95665359111859ap1971
198033,989602,0005.6%1753704858612513ap1981
199055,509845,0006.6%2637638815913619ap1991
199980,502898,5869.0%4319621,2985217810ap2000
Archdiocese of Bobo-Dioulasso
200081,220899,0229.0%4325681,1946415710ap2001
200182,434920,1529.0%4824721,1447617410ap2002
200283,745925,0029.1%4328711,1798022612ap2003
200386,846922,0259.4%5127781,1136617812ap2004
200486,919925,0259.4%5129801,0867319412ap2005
200699,2401,014,0009.8%5529841,1816118814ap2007
2012155,0001,284,00012.1%6220821,8908919217ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 9 Sep 2013