Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Der Raphaël Dabiré Kusiélé

Bishop of Diébougou


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1948 BornDissin
12 Jul 197527.2Ordained PriestPriest of Diébougou, Burkina Faso
3 Apr 200657.9AppointedBishop of Diébougou, Burkina Faso
24 Jun 200658.2Ordained BishopBishop of Diébougou, Burkina Faso

MicroData Summary for Der Raphaël Dabiré Kusiélé:
Bishop Der Raphaël Dabiré Kusiélé (born ) Bishop of Diébougou

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Diébougou.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Apr 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,173

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 20 Oct 2014