Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laurent Birfuoré Dabiré

Bishop of Dori, Burkina Faso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1965 Born
29 Dec 199530.2Ordained PriestPriest of Diébougou, Burkina Faso
31 Jan 201347.3AppointedBishop of Dori, Burkina Faso
4 May 201347.6Ordained BishopBishop of Dori, Burkina Faso

MicroData Summary for Laurent Birfuoré Dabiré
Bishop Laurent Birfuoré Dabiré (born ) Bishop of Dori

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDissin

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Dori.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Jan 2013
  • ob/c2+: CB, 18 Apr 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,782

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018