Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joachim Ouédraogo

Bishop of Koudougou


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1962 BornRouko
6 Jul 199129.3Ordained PriestPriest of Ouahigouya, Burkina Faso
20 Nov 200442.7AppointedBishop of Dori, Burkina Faso
19 Mar 200543.0Ordained BishopBishop of Dori, Burkina Faso
4 Nov 201149.6AppointedBishop of Koudougou, Burkina Faso
17 Dec 201149.7InstalledBishop of Koudougou, Burkina Faso

MicroData Summary for Joachim Ouédraogo:
Bishop Joachim Ouédraogo (born ) Bishop of Koudougou

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Koudougou.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,837
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2011
  • i: CB, 24 Dec 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013