Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Alexandre Yikyi Bazié

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Koudougou, Burkina Faso

Titular Bishop of Gummi in Byzacena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1960 Born
19 Jul 198726.9Ordained PriestPriest of Koudougou, Burkina Faso
25 Mar 201958.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Koudougou, Burkina Faso
25 Mar 201958.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Gummi in Byzacena
29 Jun 201958.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gummi in Byzacena

MicroData Summary for Alexandre Yikyi Bazié
Father Alexandre Yikyi Bazié (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Koudougou

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTénado, Diocese of Koudougou
Ordained BishopCathedral, Koudougou, Diocese of Koudougou

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Koudougou.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2019
  • ob: CB, 14 May 2019
  • c2+: CB, 17 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 18 May 2019

Quantcast