Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Justin Kientega

Bishop of Ouahigouya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1959 BornTemnaoré
25 Jul 198728.0Ordained PriestPriest of Koudougou, Burkina Faso
2 Feb 201050.6AppointedBishop of Ouahigouya, Burkina Faso
29 May 201050.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ouahigouya, Burkina Faso

MicroData Summary for Justin Kientega:
Bishop Justin Kientega (born ) Bishop of Ouahigouya

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ouahigouya.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,647

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013