Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Paul Cardinal Zoungrana, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Ouagadougou

Cardinal-Priest of San Camillo de Lellis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1917BornOuagadougou
2 May 194224.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
5 Apr 196042.5AppointedArchbishop of Ouagadougou, Burkina Faso
8 May 196042.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Ouagadougou, Burkina Faso
22 Feb 196547.4Elevated to Cardinal
22 Feb 196547.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Camillo de Lellis
10 Jun 199577.7RetiredArchbishop of Ouagadougou, Burkina Faso
4 Jun 200082.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Ouagadougou, Burkina Faso

MicroData Summary for Paul Zoungrana:
Paul Cardinal Zoungrana M. Afr. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Ouagadougou

  • a priest for 58.0 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
  • a cardinal for 35.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 39
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015