Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcel Pierre Marie Chauvin, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fada N’Gourma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1914BornCouëron, France
8 Sep 193218.4ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
29 Aug 193925.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
16 Jun 196450.1AppointedBishop of Fada N’Gourma, Burkina Faso
20 Dec 196450.7Ordained BishopBishop of Fada N’Gourma, Burkina Faso
15 Jun 197965.1ResignedBishop of Fada N’Gourma, Burkina Faso
2 Jul 200490.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Fada N’Gourma, Burkina Faso

MicroData Summary for Marcel Pierre Marie Chauvin:
Bishop Marcel Pierre Marie Chauvin C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fada N’Gourma

  • a priest for 64.8 years
  • a bishop for 39.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 29 Sep 2013