Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Niamey

Archidioecesis Niameyensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Michel Christian Cartatéguy, S.M.A., Archbishop
  • Djalwana Laurent Lompo, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Guy Armand Romano, C.SS.R., Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 25 June 2007
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Niger
  • Square Kilometers: 200,000 (77,250 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: B.P. 10270, Niamey, Niger
  • Telephone: 73.32.59
  • Fax: 73.80.01

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Niamey
28 April 1942ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Dahomey
Vicariate Apostolic of Foumban
Prefecture Apostolic of Ghardaïa nel Sahara
Prefecture Apostolic of Jos
Prefecture Apostolic of Kaduna
Vicariate Apostolic of Khartoum
Vicariate Apostolic of Ouagadougou
Prefecture Apostolic of Niamey (erected)
13 May 1948Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Niamey Prefecture Apostolic of Parakou (erected)
12 February 1959Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Niamey Prefecture Apostolic of Fada N’Gourma (erected)
Diocese of Niamey
21 March 1961ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Niamey Diocese of Niamey
13 March 2001Territory LostDiocese of Niamey Diocese of Maradi (erected)
Archdiocese of Niamey
25 June 2007ElevatedDiocese of Niamey Archdiocese of Niamey

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Niamey
19503,9172,200,000.2%1595ap1951
Diocese of Niamey
197012,5003,985,000.3%6202648032667ap1971
198012,6005,150,000.2%42327466376811ap1981
199016,3007,106,000.2%72835465377821ap1991
199917,50010,000,000.2%43741426459121ap2000
200020,00010,000,000.2%102333606307818ap2001
200118,5005,000,000.4%52530616355214ap2002
200210,7004,950,000.2%131326411204310ap2003
200315,0005,840,000.3%61723652254810ap2004
200415,0005,880,000.3%101929517214510ap2005
Archdiocese of Niamey

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013