Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Parakou

Archidioecesis Parakuensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Pascal N’Koué, Archbishop
  • Fidèle Agbatchi, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 16 October 1997
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Benin
  • Square Kilometers: 9,259 (3,576 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocese-parakou.org/
  • Mailing Address: Archeveche, B.P. 75, Parakou, Benin
  • Telephone: 23.61.02.54
  • Fax: 23.61.01.09

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Parakou
13 May 1948ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Niamey Prefecture Apostolic of Parakou (erected)
10 February 1964Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Parakou Diocese of Natitingou (erected)
Diocese of Parakou
10 February 1964ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Parakou Diocese of Parakou
19 December 1994Territory LostDiocese of Parakou Diocese of Kandi (erected)
Archdiocese of Parakou
16 October 1997ElevatedDiocese of Parakou Archdiocese of Parakou
22 December 1999Territory LostArchdiocese of Parakou Diocese of N’Dali (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Parakou
19503,859451,060.9%17172271410ap1951
Diocese of Parakou
197010,454317,0003.3%119205222130ap1971
198018,840483,0003.9%61420942182416ap1981
199042,686621,6306.9%172845948358517ap1991
Archdiocese of Parakou
199962,577637,2259.8%2126471,3315011615ap2000
200059,233227,49026.0%1714311,91030858ap2001
200162,207308,52620.2%1917361,72742638ap2004
200468,477334,28820.5%2020401,711421177ap2005
2010184,000398,00046.2%3414483,833376614ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 10 Jul 2013