Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clet Feliho

Bishop of Kandi, Benin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1954 Born
21 Jul 197925.4Ordained PriestPriest of Parakou, Benin
29 Jan 200045.9AppointedBishop of Kandi, Benin
10 Jun 200046.3Ordained BishopBishop of Kandi, Benin

MicroData Summary for Clet Feliho
Bishop Clet Feliho (born ) Bishop of Kandi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConakry

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kandi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,781
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018