Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Conakry {Konakry}

Archidioecesis Konakriensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Vincent Coulibaly, Archbishop
  • François Sylla, Coadjutor Archbishop-Elect

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 14 September 1955
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Guinea
  • Square Kilometers: 88,664 (34,246 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: https://www.archidioceseconakry.fr/
  • Mailing Address: Archeveche, B.P. 2016, Conakry, Guinee
  • Telephone: 662.90.28.72

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Guinea Francese
18 October 1897ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Senegambia
Vicariate Apostolic of Sierra Leone
Prefecture Apostolic of Guinea Francese (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Guinea Francese
18 April 1920ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Guinea Francese Vicariate Apostolic of Guinea Francese
12 May 1949Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Guinea Francese (Eastern part) Prefecture Apostolic of Kankan (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Conakry
12 May 1949Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Guinea Francese Vicariate Apostolic of Conakry
Archdiocese of Conakry {Konakry}
14 September 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Conakry Archdiocese of Conakry {Konakry}
22 February 2024Territory LostArchdiocese of Conakry {Konakry} Diocese of Boké (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Conakry
195010,7981,177,005.9%2222444923272ap1951
Archdiocese of Conakry {Konakry}
197014,8481,500,0001.0%82101,48421615ap1971
197720,0002,000,0001.0%111121,66611112ap1991
199934,0003,700,000.9%1714311,096246233ap2000
200035,0003,750,000.9%2013331,060236133ap2001
200140,0003,750,0001.1%1921401,000426333ap2002
200240,0003,750,0001.1%2216381,052326833ap2003
200340,0003,750,0001.1%2317401,000266833ap2004
200440,0003,800,8001.1%2314371,081236333ap2005
2006101,6003,860,0002.6%2515402,540397333ap2007
2013129,2584,554,0002.8%4115562,308446335ap2014
2016144,3305,120,3072.8%5215672,154337735ap2017
2019153,0005,559,7002.8%5112632,428377236ap2020
2021161,7005,877,4352.8%6216782,073447938ap2022
2024170,0005,211,5303.3%4714612,786196732bul:22Feb2024

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Vicariate Apostolic of Conakry
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 41, Page 533, and Page 534
  • Archdiocese of Conakry {Konakry}
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 48, Page 113, to Page 119

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.7, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 14 May 2024