Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymond-René Lerouge, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Conakry, Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1876Born
27 Oct 190125.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
9 Mar 191134.6AppointedPrefect of Guinea Francese, Guinea
22 Apr 192043.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Selge
22 Apr 192043.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Guinea Francese, Guinea
25 May 192043.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Selge
12 May 194972.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Conakry, Guinea
2 Jul 194972.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Conakry, Guinea

MicroData Summary for Raymond-René Lerouge
Bishop Raymond-René Lerouge C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Conakry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa-Chaise-Baudoin, France

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017