Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexandre-Louis-Victor-Aimé Le Roy, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Congregation of the Holy Spirit

Titular Archbishop of Caria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1854BornSaint-Sénier-de-Beuvron, France
10 Aug 187622.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
3 Jun 189238.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Gabon, Gabon
3 Jun 189238.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Alinda
9 Oct 189238.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alinda
24 May 189642.3AppointedSuperior General of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
16 Jun 192167.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caria
18 Jun 192672.4RetiredSuperior General of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
21 Apr 193884.3DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Congregation of the Holy Spirit

MicroData Summary for Alexandre-Louis-Victor-Aimé Le Roy:
Bishop Alexandre-Louis-Victor-Aimé Le Roy C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Superior General Emeritus of Congregation of the Holy Spirit

  • a priest for 61.7 years
  • a bishop for 45.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 89

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013