Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Guérard

Deceased

Bishop of Coutances (-Avranches), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1846³Born
13 Mar 186923.1Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jul 189852.4SelectedBishop of Coutances (-Avranches), France
28 Nov 189852.8ConfirmedBishop of Coutances (-Avranches), France
2 Feb 189953.0Ordained BishopBishop of Coutances (-Avranches), France
19 Jul 192478.4DiedBishop of Coutances (-Avranches), France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Guérard (VIAF: 211334886)
Bishop Joseph Guérard (born , died ) Bishop of Coutances (-Avranches)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLoudéac
Ordained BishopRennes, Archdiocese of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)
Death PlaceCoutances, Diocese of Coutances (-Avranches)

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 222
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017