Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Henri Louis Charles Maret

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Naupactus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1805BornMéyrueis, France
5 Jun 183025.1Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jul 186156.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sura
25 Aug 186156.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sura
15 Sep 188277.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Naupactus
16 Jun 188479.2DiedTitular Archbishop of Naupactus

MicroData Summary for Henri Louis Charles Maret:
Archbishop Henri Louis Charles Maret (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Naupactus

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 404, and Page 529

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013