Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Guillaume-René Cardinal Meignan

Deceased

Archbishop of Tours, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1817Born
13 Jun 184023.1Ordained PriestPriest
12 Oct 186447.5SelectedBishop of Châlons, France
27 Mar 186547.9ConfirmedBishop of Châlons, France
1 May 186548.0Ordained BishopBishop of Châlons, France
23 Sep 188265.4SelectedBishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France
25 Sep 188265.4ConfirmedBishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France
21 Feb 188466.8SelectedArchbishop of Tours, France
24 Mar 188466.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Tours, France
27 May 188467.1InstalledArchbishop of Tours, France
16 Jan 189375.7Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jun 189376.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio
20 Jan 189678.7DiedArchbishop of Tours, France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume-René Meignan (VIAF: 22133177)
Guillaume-René Cardinal Meignan (born , died ) Archbishop of Tours

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDenazé, Diocese of Le Mans
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceTours, Archdiocese of Tours
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Tours, Archdiocese of Tours

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 30.7 years
  • a cardinal for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 129, and Page 192
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 573, and Page 53
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Jan 1893
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1865, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 4 Feb 2017