Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Charles Buquet

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Paris

Titular Bishop of Paros


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1796BornParis
12 Jun 182427.6Ordained PriestPriest
1 Oct 186366.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
1 Oct 186366.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Paros
30 Nov 186367.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Paros
17 Jan 187275.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Charles Buquet:
Bishop Louis-Charles Buquet (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Paris

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 441

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013