Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfred-Casimir-Alexis Williez

Deceased

Bishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1836Born
2 Jun 186024.0Ordained PriestPriest
2 Apr 189255.8SelectedBishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France
11 Jul 189256.1ConfirmedBishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France
8 Sep 189256.3Ordained BishopBishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France
25 Jan 191174.6DiedBishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France

MicroData Summary for Alfred-Casimir-Alexis Williez (VIAF: 315730036)
Bishop Alfred-Casimir-Alexis Williez (born , died ) Bishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChinon
Ordained BishopCathedral, Arras, Diocese of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer)

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 129
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017