Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustin-Victor Deramecourt

Deceased

Bishop of Soissons (-Laon), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1841Born
23 Sep 186524.5Ordained PriestPriest of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France
22 Mar 189857.0SelectedBishop of Soissons (-Laon), France
24 Mar 189857.0ConfirmedBishop of Soissons (-Laon), France
24 Jun 189857.2Ordained BishopBishop of Soissons (-Laon), France
16 Sep 190665.5DiedBishop of Soissons (-Laon), France

MicroData Summary for Augustin-Victor Deramecourt (VIAF: 88849408)
Bishop Augustin-Victor Deramecourt (born , died ) Bishop of Soissons (-Laon)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeauvois
Ordained BishopCathedral, Soissons, Diocese of Soissons (-Laon)

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 8.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 529
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017