Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Etienne-Marie Potron, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Ierichus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1836Born
1863¹26.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
25 Jun 188952.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Ierichus
29 Jun 188952.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ierichus
11 Aug 1905³68.7DiedTitular Bishop of Ierichus

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Etienne-Marie Potron (VIAF: 205525103)
Bishop Etienne-Marie Potron O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Ierichus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrest, France
Ordained BishopS. Antonio-Via Merulana, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 319
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017