Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernardino (Giuseppe) dal Vago (da Portogruaro), O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Serdica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1822Born
27 Nov 184220.8ProfessedMember of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
21 Sep 184422.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
14 Mar 186947.1AppointedMinister General of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
1888²65.9ResignedMinister General of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
13 Sep 189270.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Serdica
18 Sep 189270.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Serdica
7 May 189573.3DiedTitular Archbishop of Serdica

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardino (Giuseppe) dal Vago (da Portogruaro)
Archbishop Bernardino (Giuseppe) dal Vago (da Portogruaro) O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Serdica

EventPlace
Birth PlacePortogruaro, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Antoine, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 501
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 May 2017