Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jacques-Emile Sontag, C.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Ispahan, Iran

Apostolic Delegate to Persia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1869Born
8 Jun 189526.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
13 Jul 191041.0AppointedArchbishop of Ispahan, Iran
13 Jul 191041.0AppointedApostolic Delegate to Persia
28 Aug 191041.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Ispahan, Iran
27 Jul 191849.1DiedArchbishop of Ispahan, Iran

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Emile Sontag
Archbishop Jacques-Emile Sontag C.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Ispahan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDinsheim, France

  • a priest for 23.1 years
  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1910, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 8 Jan 2021

Quantcast