Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hilarion Joseph Montéty Pailhas, C.M. †

Deceased

Apostolic Delegate Emeritus to Persia

Titular Archbishop of Berytus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1854Born
21 Dec 187824.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
13 Feb 189137.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Berytus
13 Feb 189137.0AppointedApostolic Delegate to Persia
14 Jun 189137.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Berytus
Apr 1896³42.1ResignedApostolic Delegate to Persia
12 Jul 192167.4DiedApostolic Delegate Emeritus to Persia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hilarion Joseph Montéty Pailhas
Archbishop Hilarion Joseph Montéty Pailhas C.M. (born , died ) Apostolic Delegate Emeritus of Persia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCompeyre, Diocese of Rodez (-Vabres), France
Ordained BishopLazarists Chapel, 95, rue de Sevres, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 148
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 85
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018