Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-François-Ernest Ricard

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Auch (-Condom-Lectoure-Lombez)

Titular Archbishop of Ternobus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1852BornSanvensa
22 Dec 187624.8Ordained PriestPriest
5 Apr 190149.1SelectedBishop of Angoulême, France
18 Apr 190149.1ConfirmedBishop of Angoulême, France
29 Jun 190149.3Ordained BishopBishop of Angoulême, France
15 Apr 190755.1AppointedArchbishop of Auch, France
18 Sep 193482.6RetiredArchbishop of Auch (-Condom-Lectoure-Lombez), France
18 Sep 193482.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ternobus
11 Nov 194492.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Auch (-Condom-Lectoure-Lombez), France

MicroData Summary for Jean-François-Ernest Ricard:
Archbishop Jean-François-Ernest Ricard (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Auch (-Condom-Lectoure-Lombez)

  • a priest for 67.9 years
  • a bishop for 43.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 260
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 28
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013