Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Eugène Francqueville

Deceased

Bishop of Rodez (-Vabres)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1845BornAizecourt-le-Haut
6 Jun 186823.3Ordained PriestPriest
7 Dec 189954.8SelectedBishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France
14 Dec 189954.8ConfirmedBishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France
11 Mar 190055.1Ordained BishopBishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France
9 Dec 190560.8DiedBishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Eugène Francqueville:
Bishop Louis-Eugène Francqueville (born , died ) Bishop of Rodez (-Vabres)

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 489

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013