Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Marie-Léon Dizien

Deceased

Bishop of Amiens, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1846Born
16 Apr 187024.0Ordained PriestPriest
30 May 189650.1SelectedBishop of Amiens, France
25 Jun 189650.2ConfirmedBishop of Amiens, France
8 Sep 189650.4Ordained BishopBishop of Amiens, France
27 Mar 191568.9DiedBishop of Amiens, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie-Léon Dizien (VIAF: 19812186)
Bishop Jean-Marie-Léon Dizien (born , died ) Bishop of Amiens

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDomecy-sur-Cure
Ordained BishopCathedral, Sens, Archdiocese of Sens (-Auxerre)
Death PlaceAmiens, Diocese of Amiens

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 95
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017